Ingram, Diana Ruth (CPSO#: 31614)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 13 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1991 to 30 Sep 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Sep 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2004