Ingram, Karen Jennifer (CPSO#: 30073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
168 Brock Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2P4
Phone: (705) 749-3906
Fax: (705) 749-2778
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Community Care City of Kawartha Lak
Unit 8
33 Lindsay Street South
Lindsay ON  K9V 2L9
Canada
Phone: (705) 879-4112
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Haliburton Highlands Health Service
Gain Clinic
PO BOX 30
Minden ON
Minden ON  K0K 2K0
Canada
Phone: 705 457 1392 Ext. 3400
Fax: 705 286 0720
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06

Port Hope Community Health Centre
99 Toronto Road
Port Hope ON  L1A 3S4
Canada
Phone: (905) 885-2626 Ext. 254
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Ontario Shores Centre For
Mental Health
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Canada
Phone: (905) 668-5881
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: (705) 876-5120
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Haliburton Highlands FHT
Box 870 Haliburton ON
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Canada
Phone: 705 457 1212
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Ingram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ingram ( CPSO# 30073 )

Business Address:
1 - 168 Brock Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2P4
Phone Number: (705) 749-3906

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN JENNIFER INGRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INGRAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1978