Inoue, Miho (CPSO#: 80111)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kyoto Daigaku Igakubu, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2009