Inouye, Phillip Kinji (CPSO#: 75103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 250
2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8R2
Phone: (613) 726-3263
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Phillip Inouye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Inouye ( CPSO# 75103 )

Business Address:
250 - 2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8R2
Phone Number: (613) 726-3263

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILLIP KINJI INOUYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INOUYE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2004