Inouye, Tetsuo (CPSO#: 26156)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 10 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Inouye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 13 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 1 800 775 0093 Fax: 647-933-2904 www.recordsregistry.ca
Instructions: Contact above
Date Received: 03 Dec 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Dec 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Dec 2014