Ioannou, Kostas Panagiotis (CPSO#: 87120)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: Ioannou, Panagiotis Kostas (used until: 06 Apr 2010 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Cardiology
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

106-2130 Lawrence Ave. East
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6
Canada
Phone: 647-351-6646
Fax: 647-351-6648
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

207/209-77 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B7
Canada
Phone: 647-351-6646
Fax: 416-759-5399
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KOSTAS PANAGIOTIS IOANNOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IOANNOU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2012 to 16 Nov 2012
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2012 to 11 Jan 2013
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2016