Iordanov, Kolio Iordanov (CPSO#: 78724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, German, Russian

Education:Medical Academy Sofia, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2448
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iordanov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Iordanov ( CPSO# 78724 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KOLIO IORDANOV IORDANOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IORDANOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 13 Mar 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 14 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 20 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 21 Sep 2004 to 16 Jan 2005
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008