Ip, Hung Bun (CPSO#: 21428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1968

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 - 65 Harbour Square
Toronto ON  M5J 2L4
Phone: (416) 214-4774
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H.B.Ip Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ip ( CPSO# 21428 )

Business Address:
Suite 5
65 Harbour Square
Toronto ON  M5J 2L4
Phone Number: (416) 214-4774

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUNG BUN IP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1968

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Nov 1982
Summary:

 In November 1982, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Hung Bun Ip guilty of professional misconduct, 
 as defined in s. 26(31) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or 
 an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Consequently, 
 the Committee ordered that Dr. Ip be reprimanded, and that his licence to practice medicine be 
 suspended for a period of three months.  The Committee further ruled that conditions be placed on 
 Dr. Ip's licence for a period of 24 months, namely that he seek treatment and guidance from a 
 psychiatrist of his choice acceptable to the Registrar; and that the Doctor waive the 
 confidentiality of the doctor-patient relationship to the extent necessary for him to direct the 
 psychiatrist to deliver a progress report to the Registrar quarterly.  The report was to be 
 confined to those matters that bore on Dr. Ip's capacity to practice medicine without a recurrence 
 of the kind of incident that took place in this case.  The first such report was to be received by 
 the Registrar on or before thirty days prior to the expiration of the suspension and every three 
 months thereafter.  The Committee also ordered that the penalty be recorded on the College 
 Register and recommended that it be published.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 07 Jun 1984
Hearing Date(s): 16 Sep 1982