Ip, Stephen Kwen-Lam (CPSO#: 22517)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Taiwan University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen K. Ip Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013