Ipekian, Sarah Alexandra (CPSO#: 86510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Names: Armstrong, Sarah Alexandra (used until: 11 Sep 2014 )     Ipekian, Sarah Alexandra Armstrong (used until: 11 Sep 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
325 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N1
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Fax: (416) 284-0141
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ALEXANDRA IPEKIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IPEKIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2011