Iqbal, Sameena Zabeen (CPSO#: 66794)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2002