Ireland, Eric John (CPSO#: 28569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5C
6 Rylander Blvd
Scarborough ON  M1B 0B6
Phone: (416) 283-5870
Fax: (416) 724-5870
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PH 12,
4168 Finch Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1S 5H6
Canada
Phone: (416) 321-3763
Fax: (416) 321-0991
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 28 Jun 2011

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC JOHN IRELAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRELAND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2012