Irish, Brendan Medland Ross (CPSO#: 105855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PGY3 Enhanced Skills Programs
Department of Family Medicine
Queen's University
115 Clarence Street, Room 311
Kingston ON  K7L 0A3
Phone: (613) 533-9300 Ext. 73005
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.C. Irish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Irish ( CPSO# 105855)
Dr. J. Irish ( CPSO# 54080 )

Business Address:
Suite 3-954
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2149

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDAN MEDLAND ROSS IRISH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. IRISH is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. IRISH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. IRISH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. IRISH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. IRISH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. IRISH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018