Irish, Jonathan Crawford (CPSO#: 54080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Mar 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 3-954
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2149
Fax: (416) 946-2300
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.C. Irish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Irish ( CPSO# 105855)
Dr. J. Irish ( CPSO# 54080 )

Business Address:
Suite 3-954
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2149

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 07 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN CRAWFORD IRISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRISH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1987