Irish, Michael Shawn (CPSO#: 66267)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Kansas, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994