Ironside, Sarah Anne (CPSO#: 94145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neurology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 416-480-4766
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 29 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ANNE IRONSIDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRONSIDE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2016