Irshad, Kashif (CPSO#: 79876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 318
2250 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 458-4520
Fax: (905) 458-4080
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irshad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Irshad ( CPSO# 79876 )

Business Address:
Suite 318
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 458-4520

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KASHIF IRSHAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRSHAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2006