Irvin, Richard Terrence (CPSO#: 22616)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: rirvin@rogers.com
Instructions: Patients may e-mail their medical record requests to Dr. Irvin.
Date Received: 04 Jun 2014


Address: 2 Garrett Crescent Barrie, ON L4M 4R8
Date Received: 28 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014