Irvine, Ian Gordon (CPSO#: 21256)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1968
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 20 Jul 1996
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 19 Aug 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Jun 1996
Summary:

 In June 1996, Dr. Irvine pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct in that he engaged 
 in sexual impropriety with a patient, as defined in s. 29(30) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as 
 amended.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Irvine guilty of professional 
 misconduct.  Consequently the Committee imposed the following penalty:

1.	A reprimand, the fact 
 of which is to be recorded on the Register.

2.	A suspension of his certificate of registration 
 for six (6) months, five (5) months of which were to be suspended on a number of 
 conditions:

a)	Dr. Irvine was to see his treating psychiatrist until at least the end of 1996, or 
 later as deemed appropriate by the psychiatrist;

b)	Dr. Irvine was to consent to the treating 
 psychiatrist reporting to the College on his progress at the end of 1996;

c)	Dr. Irvine was to 
 perform a community service of an appropriate character acceptable to the College.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 06, 1996