Irvine, Richard Alexander (CPSO#: 25701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1973

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 13
170 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3E9
Phone: (519) 725-1514
Fax: (519) 725-5137
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

K-W Walk In Clinic
100 The Boardwalk
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B4
Canada
Phone: (519) 279-4098
Fax: (519) 279-4099
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Westmount Place Walk In Clinic
50 Westmount Road North
Waterloo ON  N2L 6N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 954-0111
Fax: (519) 954-0112
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard A. Irvine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Irvine ( CPSO# 25701 )

Business Address:
13 - 170 University Avenue
Waterloo ON  N2L 3E9
Phone Number: (519) 725-1514

Business Address:
K-W Walk In Clinic
100 The Boardwalk
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B4
Phone Number: (519) 279-4098

Business Address:
Westmount Place Walk In Clinic
50 Westmount Road North
Waterloo ON  N2L 6N9
Phone Number: (519) 954-0111

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ALEXANDER IRVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRVINE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Apr 2012

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Nov 2011
Summary:

 On November 15, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Richard Alexander Irvine committed an 
 act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to 
 the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
 regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
Dr. Irvine engaged in 
 prescribing to family members contrary to College policy; treating family members for conditions 
 which were not urgent; treating family members where other health care professionals were 
 available; and, treating family members and not taking steps to transfer their care to other 
 physicians.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	The Registrar suspend Dr. 
 Irvine's certificate of registration for a period of four (4) months, to commence December 1st, 
 2011.  
2.	Dr. Irvine appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3.	Dr. Irvine pay to the College 
 costs in the amount of $3,650.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 15, 2011