Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Irwin, Michael Eugene (CPSO#: 19105)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Mar 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Storage, (416) 781-9083 or 1-(888) 781-9083, Roseville Garden Walk-In Clinic, (519) 944-3393, Family Care Walk-In Medical Clinic, 2425 Tecumseh Road East, Windsor, ON, N8W 1E6
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016


Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Phone: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 20 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Mar 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 24, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective March 24, 2016, Dr. Irwin voluntarily resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.