Irwin, Roy Stewart (CPSO#: 11620)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1943

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1866
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1944
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Apr 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 1987