Irwin, Samantha Lee (CPSO#: 98937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UCSF Pediatric Neurology
5th Floor
1825 4th Street
San Francisco CA  94158
United States
Phone: (415) 353-7596

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA LEE IRWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRWIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2017