Irwin, Samuel Patrick (CPSO#: 27225)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. P. Irwin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 4, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Samuel Patrick Irwin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):

I, Dr. Samuel Patrick Irwin:

(2) Acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation (the “Investigation”) by the College regarding whether I have sexually abused a patient, my conduct towards the patient, and whether I have maintained the standard of practice of the profession in my care and treatment of the patient in issue (the “Investigation”).

(3) Acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation.

(4) Resign from the College effective May 31, 2014 (the “Effective Date”).

(5) Undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

(6) Agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I am in breach of this Undertaking including, but not limited to, becoming aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration, or equivalent, to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the Investigation it terminated as a result of this Undertaking and/or to proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(13) Consent to this undertaking being entered on the public register as information that is available to the public.