Isaac, Errol Barrymore (CPSO#: 23021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suites 2 and 3
760 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4B7
Phone: (905) 637-7606
Fax: (905) 637-2139
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2200 Fairview ST
Burlington ON  L7R 4H9
Canada
Phone: 905-333-6700
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Errol Isaac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 24 2007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERROL BARRYMORE ISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAAC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1970