Isaac, Isaac Fahim (CPSO#: 63357)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
231 Wharncliffe Road
London ON  N6J 2L3
Phone: (519) 641-5789
Fax: (519) 641-3949
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Isaac F. Isaac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Isaac ( CPSO# 63357 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
231 Wharncliffe Road South
London ON  N6J 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 641-5789

Business Address:
528 Dundas Street
London ON  N6B 1W6
Phone Number: (519) 641-5789

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISAAC FAHIM ISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1998