Isaac, Lisa Anne (CPSO#: 66420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Anesthesia & Pain Medicine
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA ANNE ISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAAC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999