Isaac, Sandra Lynn (CPSO#: 59435)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Boniface Park Medical Centre
700 Markham Road unit #7
Scarborough ON
M1H 2A7
Toronto ON  M1H 2A7
Phone: (416) 264-3443
Fax: (416) 264-3446
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Barrie Community Health Centre
490 Huronia Rd
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 734-9690
Fax: (705) 734-0239
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA LYNN ISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAAC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1989