Isaak, Verner Herman (CPSO#: 19962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1966

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1966

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maplehurst Correctional Complex
PO Box 10
661 Martin Street
Milton ON  L9T 2X3
Phone: (905) 878-8141
Fax: (905) 878-1435
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Syl Apps Youth Centre
475 Iroquois Shores Road
Oakville ON  L6H 1M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 844-4110
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Verner H. Isaak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Isaak ( CPSO# 19962 )

Business Address:
475 Iroquois Shores Road
Oakville ON  L6H 1M3
Phone Number: (905) 844-4110

Business Address:
Maplehurst Correctional Centre
661 Martin Street
P O Box 10
Milton ON  L9T 2Y3
Phone Number: (905) 878-8141

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VERNER HERMAN ISAAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAAK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1966