Isac, Michelle Marie (CPSO#: 77492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Isac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Isac ( CPSO# 77492 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE MARIE ISAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2008