Isak, Pavlo Ivan (CPSO#: 106950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 3063615859
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAVLO IVAN ISAK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ISAK is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. ISAK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ISAK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ISAK shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ISAK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ISAK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018