Iscove, Melvyn Lawrence (CPSO#: 25567)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Feb 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
272 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 204
Toronto ON  M5M 4M1
Phone: (416) 782-6253
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 02 Jan 2017

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Iscove’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Iscove engaged in sexual abuse of two patients, including but not limited sexual acts during therapy sessions and, on at least one occasion, at Dr. Iscove’s home. Dr. Iscove also engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct in, among other things, his boundaries, his communications and his relationships with the patients.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Motion: October 24, 2016 Hearing: June 12 & 13, 2017, June 26 to 30, 2017, and September 5, 2017

Hearing Status: Decision Under Reserve


Summary: Allegations of Dr. Iscove’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Iscove engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or conduct unbecoming a physician by, among other things, improper conduct in a public men’s washroom in about January, 2014.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 01 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., January 2, 2017, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Melvyn Lawrence Iscove:

            1.    Dr. Iscove shall not engage in any professional encounters with his
                  remaining female patients unless this encounter takes place in the
                  presence of a monitor who is a member of a regulated health profession
                  and who is acceptable to the College.

            2.    The monitor shall sign an undertaking with the College in the form
                  appended to the March 5, 2016 order of the ICRC and report to the College
                  on at least a monthly basis.



            As from 12:01 a.m., June 2, 2016, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Melvyn Lawrence Iscove:

            Practice Monitor and Patient Log

                  (i)   Dr. Iscove shall not engage in any professional encounters with
                        male patients of any age;
                  
                  (ii)  Dr. Iscove shall not engage in any professional encounters with
                        female patients of any age, unless:
                  
                        a.    The patient is an active patient of Dr. Iscove as of June 1,
                              2016;
                  
                        b.    The patient receives, reviews and acknowledges this Order and
                              the Notice of Hearing dated February 10, 2016 and the
                              patient's acknowledgement is kept in the patient chart; and
                  
                        c.    The patient consents in writing to being treated by Dr.
                              Iscove after receiving, reviewing and acknowledging the
                              documents set out in (b) above.
                  
                  (iii) Dr. Iscove shall:
                  
                        a.    Provide to the College a list of all active female patients
                              in his practice as of June 1, 2016, within seven (7) days of
                              the date of this Order;
                  
                        b.    Keep a patient log in the form attached as Appendix "A" to
                              this Order of all the patients that Dr. Iscove has an
                              in-person encounter with; 
                  
                        c.    Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis;
                              and 
                  
                        d.    Maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and make it
                              available to the College upon request.
                  
            Notification of Practice Locations

                  (iv)  Dr. Iscove shall inform the College of each and every location that
                        he practices including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s)
                        and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice
                        Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days of this Order.  Going
                        forward, he shall inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location;
                  
                  
                  
            Posting a Sign and Translations

                  (v)   Dr. Iscove shall post a sign in his waiting room(s) and each of his
                        examination and/or consulting rooms, in all of his Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                        attached hereto as Appendix "B";
                  
                  (vi)  Dr. Iscove shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s)
                        in which he provides services, of the sign described in (v) above,
                        in his waiting room(s) and each of his examination and/or
                        consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location;
                  
                  (vii) Dr. Iscove shall provide the certified translation(s) described in
                        (vi) above within 30 days of the date of this Order;
                  
            Monitoring

                  (viii)Dr. Iscove shall consent to the College to make appropriate
                        enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or
                        institution who may have relevant information in order for the
                        College to monitor Dr. Iscove's compliance with the terms of this
                        Order and shall promptly sign such consents as may be necessary for
                        the College to obtain information from these persons or
                        institutions;
                  
                  (ix)  Dr. Iscove shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                        inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient
                        charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                        necessary in order to monitor Dr. Iscove's compliance with the
                        terms of this Order;
                  
                  (x)   Dr. Iscove shall consent to the College providing any and all
                        information to the Practice Monitor that the College deems
                        necessary or desirable in order to assist the Practice Monitor in
                        fulfilling her Undertaking and in order to monitor Dr. Iscove's
                        compliance with the terms of this Order;
                  
                  (xi)  Dr. Iscove shall consent to all Practice Monitors to disclose to
                        the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this
                        Order, relevant to the terms of the Practice Monitor's Undertaking
                        and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Iscove's
                        compliance with this Order; and
                  
                  (xii) Dr. Iscove shall consent to the College providing the Order to any
                        Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                        any Practice Location where I practice or have privileges
                        ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with
                        any information the College has that led to this Order and/or any
                        information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                        Order.