Iscove, Norman Nelson (CPSO#: 21419)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Mar 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008