Isenberg, Joel Harold (CPSO#: 60031)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Spanish, Yiddish

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17 Cedar Ave. N
Timmins ON  P4N 6H8
Phone: (705) 264-2174
Fax: (705) 264-2184
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

21 Queensway West
Suite 111
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: 905-897-0788
Fax: 905-897-9229
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

42 Second st. east
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 1R1
Canada
Phone: (705) 567-7778
Fax: (705) 567-6664
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Isenberg Shapiro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shapiro ( CPSO# 33588 )
Dr. J. Isenberg ( CPSO# 60031 )

Business Address:
42 Second Street East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 1R1
Phone Number: (705) 567-7778

Business Address:
334 Spring Gate Boulevard
Vaughan ON  L4J 3L9

Business Address:
135 Applegrove Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1N2

Business Address:
17 Cedar Street North
Timmins ON  P4N 6H8
Phone Number: (705) 264-2174


Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Harold Isenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Libman ( CPSO# 25680 )
Dr. J. Isenberg ( CPSO# 60031 )

Business Address:
42 Second Street East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 1R1
Phone Number: (705) 567-7778

Business Address:
17 Cedar Street North
Timmins ON  P4N 6H8

Business Address:
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-9228

Business Address:
Medical Centre
2550A Finch Avenue West
Weston ON  M9M 2G3

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL HAROLD ISENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISENBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988