Isfan, Daniela (CPSO#: 60182)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Jun 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:Laval University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Owen Sound Hospital
1800 8th St. E
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Canada
Phone: 519-376-2121
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts
USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jun 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Daniela  Isfan  may  practise  medicine only as a surgical assistant
                  under direction of a Royal  College  of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
                  certified surgeon or College recognized  specialist  in  surgery  who  is
                  physically   in  attendance  when  Dr.  Isfan  practices  as  a  surgical
                  assistant. 

            2.    Dr. Isfan shall  not  practice medicine as the Most Responsible Physician
                  for any patient(s).

            3.    Dr. Isfan shall not provide  any  pre-operative or post-operative care to
                  any patient(s).