Ishak, Fadel Amin (CPSO#: 50837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
272 Cedar Street
Sudbury ON  P3B 1M7
Phone: (705) 673-4415
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Northeastern Ontario Regional
Cancer Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 522-6237
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fadel Ishak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017


Corporation Name: Ishak and Sami Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sami ( CPSO# 52223 )
Dr. F. Ishak ( CPSO# 50837 )

Business Address:
272 Cedar Street
Sudbury ON  P3B 1M7
Phone Number: (705) 673-4415

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7329

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 16 Sep 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FADEL AMIN ISHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISHAK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1984