Ishkanian, Adrian Shea (CPSO#: 84460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 4th ave
St Catharines ON  L2S0A9
Phone: 905-682-6451
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIAN SHEA ISHKANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISHKANIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2012