Iskander, Alexander Wilson (CPSO#: 68744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Gezira, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone: (416) 782-1016
Fax: (416) 782-1742
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alex W. Iskander Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Iskander ( CPSO# 68744 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone Number: (416) 782-1016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER WILSON ISKANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISKANDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2000