Iskander, Mariam Faseeh Grais (CPSO#: 69911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thornhill Square
300 John Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone: (905) 764-0188
Fax: (905) 764-0189
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIAM FASEEH GRAIS ISKANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISKANDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1998