Islam, Shahidul (CPSO#: 82041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Nov 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Dhaka, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Div. Anatomical Pathology
Rm 1440 Box 115
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 78297
Fax: (613) 737-6881
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 16 Nov 2004 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Nov 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Shahidul Islam may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.