Isles, Katherine (CPSO#: 31035)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
304 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M9B 6C2
Phone: (416) 231-7968
Fax: (416) 231-7982
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5460 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Canada
Phone: (416) 250-7171
Fax: (416) 250-0323
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Unit 9
4646 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Canada
Phone: (416) 512-6407
Fax: (416) 512-6375
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 335
5945 Airport Road
Mississauga ON  L4V 1N3
Canada
Phone: (905) 678-2924
Fax: (905) 678-2939
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

150 sherway drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1C5
Canada
Phone: 416 521 4141
Fax: 416 521 4123
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Isles, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Isles ( CPSO# 31035 )

Business Address:
335 - 5945 Airport Road
Mississauga ON  L4V 1R9
Phone Number: (905) 678-2924

Business Address:
3rd Floor - 150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 251-4141

Business Address:
102 - 304 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M9B 6E2
Phone Number: (416) 231-7968

Business Address:
9 - 4646 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Phone Number: (416) 512-6407

Business Address:
204 - 5460 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Phone Number: (416) 250-7171

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE ISLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISLES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1978 to 18 Jun 1979
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1979