Ismail, Abdel-Raouf (CPSO#: 28956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Queensway west
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-9228
Fax: (905) 897-7780
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

450 Bronte South,Unit 201
Milton ON  L9T8T2
Canada
Phone: 905-636-9387
Fax: 905-636-9388
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

50 Burnhamthorpe Road West,Suite343
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Canada
Phone: 905-273-4888
Fax: 905-273-5581
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdel-Raouf Ismail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ismail ( CPSO# 28956 )

Business Address:
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-9228

Business Address:
Suite 201
450 Bronte Street South
Toronto ON  L9T 8T2
Phone Number: (905) 636-9387

Business Address:
Suite 343
50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Phone Number: (905) 273-4888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 01 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDEL-RAOUF ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1980