Ismail, Farooq Firoz (CPSO#: 73933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Kachchi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Park Health Care Centre
82 Buttonwood Avenue
R3-92
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone: (416) 243-3600 Ext. 3680
Fax: (416) 243-1177
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: 705 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farooq F. Ismail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ismail ( CPSO# 73933 )

Business Address:
West Park Health Care Centre
Suite R3-92
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone Number: (416) 243-3680

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAROOQ FIROZ ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004