Isotalo, Phillip Andrew (CPSO#: 69966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILLIP ANDREW ISOTALO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISOTALO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2002