Israel, James Albert (CPSO#: 21300)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James A. Israel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Israel ( CPSO# 21300 )

Business Address:
105 Park Street
Waterloo ON  N2L 1Y3
Phone Number: (519) 576-0629

Medical Records Location

Address: 250 Lions Gate, Waterloo ON N2L 6M5
Date Received: 09 Dec 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Dec 2017