Issa, Farrah (CPSO#: 103944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 45604 Chapman Mills
Ottawa ON  K2J 0P9
Phone: 613 714 2177
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farrah Issa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Issa ( CPSO# 103944)

Business Address:
PO Box 45604 Capman Mills
Ottawa ON  K2J 0P9
Phone Number: (613) 714-2177

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARRAH ISSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISSA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016