Issa, Khalil Ibrahim Khalil (CPSO#: 85924)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Jordan, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2007 to 26 Apr 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Apr 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008