Issekutz, Thomas Bela (CPSO#: 45109)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 May 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 1997