Isserlin, Leanna Elizabeth (CPSO#: 81390)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: Rutherford, Leanna Elizabeth Duff (used until: 18 Jan 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Psychiatry
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L E Isserlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Isserlin ( CPSO# 81390 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Psychiatry
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEANNA ELIZABETH ISSERLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISSERLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014