Issley, Steven Bradley (CPSO#: 75690)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Issley Josephson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Instructions: All records kept in hospitals where patient care was given.
Date Received: 31 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 28 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2000 to 31 Oct 2000
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Steven Braddley Issley to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 17, 2017:

Dr. Issley has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.